Financial history KOMBO SILLAH ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1158186
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021
Total gross income £22.05k £11.28k £12.58k £6.86k £5.80k
Total expenditure £18.95k £13.06k £10.94k £7.64k £2.50k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A