BEAUMONT ATHLETIC FC

Charity number: 1154955
Charity reporting is 1469 days late
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2020 Not yet received
8 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not yet received
8 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not yet received
373 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not yet received
373 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not yet received
739 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not yet received
739 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2017 Not yet received
1104 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not yet received
1104 days overdue
Annual return 30 April 2016 Not yet received
1469 days overdue
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not yet received
1469 days overdue
Submit annual return

( Charity users only)