INTERNATIONAL WAQF FUND

Charity number: 1162805
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 17 October 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 December 2018 25 October 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2017 22 October 2018 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2016 29 November 2017 29 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2016 Not Required