Trustees THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BURY ROCH VALLEY
Charity number: 1153843
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Joanne Curry | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Douglas | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Whitbread | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Annum Shafique | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brady | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Khan | Trustee | 10 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
David Heath | Trustee | 30 April 2019 |
|
|
||||
Carolyn Julie McGloughlin | Trustee | 01 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Peter Robinson | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Grosvenor | Trustee | 01 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Paula Heap | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jill Brady | Trustee | 01 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE DICKINSON | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
YVONNE GRIFFITHS | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA IKIN | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN KIRKBY | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.