Financial history ST HELEN AND ST KATHARINE PARENTS' ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1153819
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021
Total gross income £21.92k £24.01k £51.23k £25.54k £14.56k
Total expenditure £13.67k £9.96k £54.27k £6.67k £3.09k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A