Accounts and annual returns DRUG WATCH FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1153523
Charity reporting is overdue by 342 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 23 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 342 days
Accounts and TAR 23 August 2022 Overdue Overdue by 342 days
Annual return 23 August 2021 15 June 2023 357 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 August 2021 15 June 2023 357 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 August 2020 04 August 2021 42 days late
Accounts and TAR 23 August 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

04 August 2021 42 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 August 2019 23 June 2020 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 23 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 23 August 2018 19 June 2019 On time Download Open in new window