Accounts and annual returns MALAWI VOLUNTEER ORGANISATION UK
Charity number: 1153732
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | 23 November 2016 | 116 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | 07 December 2016 | 130 days late | |
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | 05 July 2016 | 341 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | 05 July 2016 | 341 days late |
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window