Trustees BISHOP CHALLONER SCHOOL
Charity number: 1153948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PATRICIA MARY COLLING | Chair | 25 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
OLIVE ESSIEN | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY JAMES CHRUMKA | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SAMY-JOSEPH ANDRE ETIENNE | Trustee | 25 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
SEBASTIAN JOHN FRANCIS O'CONNELL | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
TRACEY ANN CASSIDY | Trustee | 01 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEAN LEE LAKE FCA | Trustee | 14 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
REV Stephen Gerard Wymer | Trustee | 15 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.