Accounts and annual returns SAHARA HANDS

Charity number: 1154302
Charity reporting is overdue by 1723 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Overdue by 262 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 627 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Overdue by 627 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 992 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Overdue by 992 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1357 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Overdue by 1357 days
Annual return 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1723 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2018 Overdue Overdue by 1723 days