CROFTLANDS COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504076
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £13.24k £18.39k £17.97k £17.33k £5.81k
Total expenditure £11.43k £14.89k £16.47k £22.25k £9.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £1.00k N/A N/A N/A