Financial history THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTIAL PARISH OF ST JAMES THE GREAT, HAYDOCK

Charity number: 1153937
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £126.70k £153.46k £181.36k £179.73k £83.01k
Total expenditure £74.84k £168.98k £192.75k £140.13k £109.50k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A