LANCASHIRE TAAG

Charity number: 1157535
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £18.85k £21.47k £22.56k £20.80k £7.11k
Total expenditure £17.72k £26.20k £22.76k £13.62k £13.23k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 N/A N/A
Income from government grants £729 £1.18k £3.23k £200 N/A