CROFT PRESCHOOL WARRINGTON

Charity number: 1156075
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £89.49k £95.94k £111.17k £119.01k £84.19k
Total expenditure £92.79k £92.09k £93.33k £98.87k £68.41k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £28.30k £48.95k £74.34k £64.34k