THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF HARWOOD

Charity number: 1155350
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

21 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
JOYCE VICKERS Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
MELANIE WADD Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Helen Hargreaves Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Rosie Lund Trustee 03 April 2016 None on record
REBECCA Kate WEBSTER Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Stephen Mortimer Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record
Rev HEATHER MOLLOY Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Reverend Canon Wendy Oliver Chair 24 October 2013 None on record
Rev Adrienne Elizabeth Morgan Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
GAIL SPENCE Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Rev Michael John Frost Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Cinnamon Morgan Trustee 19 October 2020 None on record
Cheryl Greenhalgh Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Gary Mark Hampson Trustee 02 November 2015 None on record
Elaine Frances Shuttleworth Trustee 28 April 2019 None on record
JULIA GORDON Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Nikki Perks Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
MRS LIZ WILLIAMS Trustee 24 October 2013 None on record
Barbara Williams Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
KAREN CORLEY Trustee 03 April 2016 None on record
Mr Dave Wood Trustee 26 April 2015 None on record