FRIENDS OF ST MARY MAGDALENE CHURCH, THE HOLMWOOD

Charity number: 1155604
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £9.07k £6.82k £7.16k £6.41k £7.98k
Total expenditure £2.43k £1.75k £913 £1.84k £2.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A