NOTTINGHAM TRENT STUDENTS' UNION

Charity number: 1154401
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £6.25m £6.23m £6.26m £6.55m £5.58m
Total expenditure £6.14m £6.20m £6.18m £6.47m £5.59m
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £349.38k
Income - Donations and legacies £1.79m £1.80m £1.85m £1.88m £2.16m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.46m £4.43m £4.41m £4.68m £3.42m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.28k £1.63k £2.54k £2.29k £2.46k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £6.14m £6.20m £6.18m £6.47m £5.59m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £11.93k £12.28k £13.29k £12.53k £12.90k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0