NORTH EAST AREA MINERS' SOCIAL WELFARE TRUST FUND

Charity number: 504178
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £109.76k £94.23k £96.19k £102.36k £74.63k
Total expenditure £328.15k £333.91k £261.37k £263.91k £177.99k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A