Trustees SHINFIELD PLAYERS THEATRE
Charity number: 1154841
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GORDON DAVID BIRD | Chair | 07 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Philip James gowen | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Margaret elizabeth smith | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
jessica wilkins | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graeme rhodes | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
ellen ruth hunter | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
mark read | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
matthew david simcha chishick | Trustee | 02 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Elizabeth Lockwood | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Louise Gowen | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
GRAHAM VOCKINS | Trustee | 16 October 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.