Trustees HAMBLETON FOODSHARE

Charity number: 1156571
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Morag Elizabeth Joyce Chair 15 September 2021
None on record
Alison Jane Wright Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Ian William McNair Trustee 27 September 2023
None on record
Steven Reginald Leslie Hogg Trustee 28 November 2022
THE GRESLEY SOCIETY TRUST
Overdue by 84 days
Frances Irene Duncan Trustee 15 September 2021
None on record
Fiona Jane Harker Trustee 21 September 2020
None on record
Steve Towers Trustee 01 September 2019
None on record
Caroline Dickinson Trustee 13 June 2018
None on record
DAVID ARNOLD KERFOOT Trustee 16 March 2018
DAVID AND ELIZABETH KERFOOT CHARITABLE TRUST
Overdue by 84 days
THE PENDRAGON COMMUNITY TRUST
Received: 82 days late
ANNE ASH Trustee 06 December 2013
None on record