Trustees BOLDON AND DISTRICT U3A
Charity number: 1156104
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shirley Walkinshaw | Chair | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christine McCullough | Trustee | 20 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Susan Wendy Masters | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jo Ann Frankie | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Anne Witherington | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pam Marley | Trustee | 15 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Miller | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
William Coombs | Trustee | 13 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
GILLIAN CUCCHI | Trustee | 11 August 2020 |
|
|||||
Susan Soulsby | Trustee | 10 August 2020 |
|
|
||||
PAT DEVENPORT | Trustee | 11 May 2020 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.