Trustees EKTA-UNITY VOLUNTARY ORGANISATION
Charity number: 1159031
Charity reporting is overdue by 821 days
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suman Ghaiwal | Chair | 22 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Balvinder Dhanjal | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Jiwanjot Singh Sahota | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sanjay Jagatia | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Munakeny Chauhan | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Kamala Jayaratnam | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Julie Seaborne | Trustee | 30 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
PARMJIT BAINS | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Balbir Dhillon | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Jasvir Sandhu | Trustee | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
DR SURINDER BASU | Trustee | 10 December 2013 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.