LIBERTY CHURCH LONDON

Charity number: 1154877
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/07/2016 31/07/2017 31/07/2018 31/07/2019 31/07/2020
Total gross income £297 £1.44k £9.54k £154.00k £249.32k
Total expenditure £1.86k £1.83k £10.09k £69.87k £214.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A