Financial history NORTON SPORTS CHARITY

Charity number: 1154688
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £238.22k £228.07k £229.44k £377.56k £630.48k
Total expenditure £201.26k £231.17k £237.95k £218.31k £263.67k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £32.89k £62.15k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £582.97k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £40.51k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £6.05k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £960
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £263.39k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £272
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £117.38k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £272
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0