Financial history COMPASSION

Charity number: 1157970
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £22.64k £27.05k £21.98k £22.30k £34.59k
Total expenditure £30.80k £20.12k £25.92k £15.05k £25.51k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £19.35k £18.05k £12.95k £31.85k