Trustees THE PATHOLOGICAL SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND
Charity number: 1154851
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Prof Mark Johan Arends | Chair | 25 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Soilleux | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Susanne Christine Burdak-Rothkamm | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Allan Moore | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Prof Mohammad Ilyas | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nicholas Paul West | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maria Fernanda Carriel Amary | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Prof John Philip Chad Le Quesne | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy James Kendall | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Nischalan Pillay | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Abeer Shaaban | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Professor Sarah Ellen Coupland | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Dr Luiza Moore | Trustee | 02 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Gemma Susan Petts | Trustee | 20 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Cynthia Coyne | Trustee | 03 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Marnix Jansen | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Professor Gareth Jarvis Thomas | Trustee | 21 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
DR Abhik Mukherjee | Trustee | 22 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Professor Graeme Ian Murray | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Professor Heike Irmgard Grabsch | Trustee | 30 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.