Financial history MIDDLETON POPSTARS ACADEMY OF PERFORMING ARTS LTD

Charity number: 1156500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2017 30/11/2018 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021
Total gross income £46.16k £31.60k £32.22k £121.32k £119.76k
Total expenditure £35.35k £23.04k £28.56k £65.12k £91.60k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £6.50k £1.00k N/A £114.61k £66.45k