Governing document HOWDEN GROUP FOUNDATION
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CIO - FOUNDATION REGISTERED 20 MAR 2014 AMENDED ON 14/09/2015 AS AMENDED ON 05 JUN 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2020 AS AMENDED ON 05 NOV 2020 AMENDED ON 01 DEC 2023
Charitable objects
OBJECT THE OBJECTS OF THE CIO ARE: A) RELIEF OF SICKNESS - THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH AMONG PEOPLE OR ANYONE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING FOR THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION OF PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH. B) RELIEF OF POVERTY - THE PREVENTION OR RELIEF OF POVERTY ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD BY PROVIDING: GRANTS, ITEMS AND SERVICES TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED AND/OR CHARITIES, OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS WORKING TO PREVENT OR RELIEVE POVERTY. C) RELIEF OF DISASTERS - THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF WAR, NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER OR CATASTROPHE IN FORM OF MONEY (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES, ORGANISATIONS AND/OR COUNTRIES AFFECTED INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF MEDICAL AID. D) RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT - THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT, INCLUDING ASSISTANCE TO FIND EMPLOYMENT AND SUPPORTING ENTREPRENEURSHIP. E) ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION - TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS BY PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES NOT REQUIRED TO BE PROVIDED BY THE LOCAL EDUCATION AUTHORITY FOR EDUCATION AT THE SCHOOL. F) ENVIRONMENTAL SUSTAINABILITY - TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WITH A FOCUS ON ENERGY CONSUMPTION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND RECYCLING.?
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.