Trustees ALDWICKBURY FRIENDS ASSOCIATION
Charity number: 1155137
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Olga Heleno-Walker | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hannelore Crockford | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fiona Claire Pattisson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roxan Szilvia Charleston | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lucy Elizabeth Thomson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Danica Jade Stevenson | Trustee | 01 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jane Ellen Hurst | Trustee | 19 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rakhi Gupta | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lucie Sidwell | Trustee | 01 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Evans | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Richard Gurney | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul James Symes | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Carly Procter | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rosalind Issott | Trustee | 01 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Ruth Sarah Grant | Trustee | 12 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Ann Baxter | Trustee | 01 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Chris Schanschieff | Trustee | 01 September 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.