Financial history OAKHALL CHURCH, CATERHAM

Charity number: 1156069
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £550.47k £3.99m £3.14m £481.73k £595.38k
Total expenditure £446.60k £445.24k £362.94k £442.55k £533.80k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £540.03k £3.99m £3.14m N/A £556.33k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Income - Investment £10.43k £5.10k £1.98k N/A £2.15k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £36.91k
Income - Legacies £0 £44.21k £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £446.60k £445.24k £362.94k N/A £533.80k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Governance £1.32k £4.81k £4.66k N/A £4.44k
Expenditure - Grants institution £235.61k £248.01k £140.56k N/A £282.78k
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 N/A £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 N/A £0