Financial history FRIENDS OF ST WILLIAM OF YORK CATHOLIC PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1155320
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/04/2017 01/04/2018 01/04/2019 01/04/2020 01/04/2021
Total gross income £10.92k £5.80k £2.44k £1.82k £3.15k
Total expenditure £5.63k £9.83k £2.31k £395 £30
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A