Financial history POVERTY CONCERN

Charity number: 1163477
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022
Total gross income £19.45k £26.30k £20.27k £25.88k £15.41k
Total expenditure £19.25k £25.23k £12.58k £25.82k £19.49k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £10.64k N/A N/A N/A