WIDNES FOODBANK

Charity number: 1155130
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £54.46k £71.90k £65.59k £87.44k £221.75k
Total expenditure £52.20k £59.16k £80.95k £73.58k £136.95k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A