Financial history APNA YOUTH (OUR YOUTH)

Charity number: 1156181
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £4.62k £3.35k £9.50k £3.54k £4.51k
Total expenditure £4.29k £2.99k £4.90k £5.56k £2.77k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A