MERSEY REGION EPILEPSY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 504366
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/09/2016 30/09/2017 30/09/2018 30/09/2019 30/09/2020
Total gross income £13.05k £10.78k £7.51k £141.12k £41.01k
Total expenditure £17.69k £1.85k £7.84k £5.70k £16.79k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A