ISLINGTON FOODBANK

Charity number: 1155480
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £23.99k £14.56k £21.95k £26.99k £75.75k
Total expenditure £10.63k £8.63k £11.78k £23.14k £18.51k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £21.24k £0 N/A £7.06k N/A