IKKAIDO LTD

Charity number: 1156581
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020
Total gross income £137.44k £129.87k £197.25k £401.88k £316.89k
Total expenditure £119.31k £108.52k £191.99k £406.09k £279.29k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A