Trustees WASHINGTON COMMUNITY FOOD PROJECT
Charity number: 1156409
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gail Watson | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Brian Pritchard | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Scott | Trustee | 19 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Jobson | Trustee | 04 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Spellman | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Judith Petherick | Trustee | 05 February 2021 |
|
|||||
Marjorie Prince | Trustee | 04 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Natton | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Susan Laws | Trustee | 14 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
Krystal Wake | Trustee | 15 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Carol Rowe | Trustee | 02 November 2015 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.