RESTYLE YOUR WORLD UK

Charity number: 1156880
Charity reporting is up to date (2 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 02 June 2021 2 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2019 04 May 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 04 May 2020 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2018 26 May 2019 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2018 26 May 2019 On time Download
Annual return 31 July 2017 07 June 2018 7 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2017

(These accounts
have been qualified)

07 June 2018 7 days late Download
Annual return 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2016 08 May 2017 On time Download