Trustees LISVANE OLD SCHOOL COMMUNITY CENTRE
Charity number: 1156308
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Angela Whittle | Chair | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Allen Bolton | Trustee | 30 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
ALISON ALWENA JENSEN | Trustee | 29 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Ann Harding | Trustee | 25 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ruth Toye | Trustee | 20 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hamilton Best | Trustee | 24 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Michael Robert Archer | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Kenneth Gunney | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Margaret Hunt | Trustee | 16 November 2020 |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.