JOHN POINTON SPORTS AND RECREATION FACILITY

Charity number: 1156093
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £60.49k £55.20k £50.08k £46.32k £145.31k
Total expenditure £88.80k £84.92k £92.11k £79.55k £79.32k
Income from government contracts £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A