TREVERBYN COMMUNITY HALL

Charity number: 1156531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 30/06/2016 30/06/2017 30/06/2018 30/06/2019 30/06/2020
Total gross income £156.72k £147.14k £150.77k £158.13k £199.05k
Total expenditure £148.42k £112.51k £114.64k £138.27k £193.75k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A £39.66k