BOREHAMWOOD FOODBANK

Charity number: 1155599
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/01/2016 31/01/2017 31/01/2018 31/01/2019 31/01/2020
Total gross income £23.24k £18.05k £27.29k £22.72k £46.24k
Total expenditure £19.98k £16.86k £21.25k £23.07k £43.91k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £2.50k £0 £2.75k £400 N/A