Accounts and annual returns CARLISLE SCHOOLS' PARTNERSHIP

Charity number: 1158072
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2022 14 June 2023 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 14 June 2023 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 30 June 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 28 June 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 13 July 2020 13 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2018 21 July 2019 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2018 21 July 2019 21 days late Download Open in new window