Trustees THE ROAD SAFETY TRUST
Charity number: 1156300
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lisa Townsend | Trustee | 10 August 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Anthony Blackman | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Victoria Coker | Trustee | 09 May 2023 |
|
|||||||||
Tanya Fosdick | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Deirdre O'Reilly | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Neil Hoose | Trustee | 23 November 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Marlena Stefanska | Trustee | 22 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Chief Constable Joanne Elizabeth Shiner | Trustee | 05 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||||
Heather Ward | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Kathy Webster | Trustee | 25 April 2019 |
|
|
||||||||
Tony Fuller | Trustee | 19 January 2017 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use the Charity Commission Register of Charities and Digital Services, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.