Accounts and annual returns SILVER ROAD COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity number: 1155827
Charity reporting is overdue by 111 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Overdue Overdue by 111 days
Annual return 05 April 2022 20 February 2024 380 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 20 February 2024 380 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 29 January 2022 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021

(These accounts
have been qualified)

29 January 2022 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 25 January 2021 On time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2019 30 January 2020 On time Download Open in new window