THE REDEEMED CHRISTIAN CHURCH OF GOD, TRINITY PLACE

Charity number: 1155519
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020
Total gross income £23.77k £24.42k £22.28k £24.64k £15.29k
Total expenditure £19.49k £27.98k £25.78k £22.90k £18.56k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A