EFFINITY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1156956
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021
Total gross income £630 £25.35k £34.42k £45.92k £56.78k
Total expenditure £19.62k £11.06k £31.88k £30.60k £33.00k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A