BREAK THA CYCLE

Charity number: 1161740
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019 31/03/2020
Total gross income £978 £13.00k £5.80k £20.47k £20.19k
Total expenditure £391 £3.91k £15.31k £11.45k £10.82k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £3.80k £5.00k N/A