THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST PETER, FULHAM

Charity number: 1156028
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
STEPHEN BRIAN GARSIDE Trustee 06 February 2014 None on record
Catrin Helen Lee Trustee 01 August 2015
THE CO-MISSION INITIATIVE TRUST Received: On time
Olivia Milligan Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Arabella Wood Trustee 01 January 2014 None on record
Elizabeth Mackenroth Trustee 29 April 2018 None on record
Rev RUPERT BENJAMIN CHARLES STANDRING Chair 06 February 2014
EMMANUEL FULHAM Received: On time
THE ST MICHAEL AND ST GEORGE FULWELL MISSION INITIATIVE Received: On time
Rev David Alexander Lee Trustee 01 September 2014 None on record
Deborah Ann Phyllis Saunders Trustee 15 April 2015 None on record
Dr REBECCA MARY MACKAY IRVINE Trustee 06 February 2014 None on record
Angus McDowell Trustee 01 May 2016 None on record
Peter James Cook Trustee 19 April 2015 None on record