Financial history ST. BARNABAS SOUTHWOLD

Charity number: 1157793
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2017 31/12/2018 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021
Total gross income £601.51k £670.42k £819.78k £749.15k £758.01k
Total expenditure £612.74k £673.50k £753.08k £778.72k £800.69k
Income from government contracts £0 £16.78k £17.61k £21.08k £43.45k
Income from government grants £0 N/A N/A £14.91k £24.58k
Income - Donations and legacies £22.56k £23.06k £158.96k £5.22k £2.21k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £1.10k £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £558.75k £613.97k £641.96k £707.27k £718.47k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £15.65k £17.26k £17.42k £13.58k £12.75k
Income - Other £4.56k £16.14k £332 £23.07k £24.58k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £612.74k £673.50k £747.35k £773.02k £794.69k
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £5.74k £5.71k £6.00k
Expenditure - Governance £5.44k £16.09k £4.48k £3.31k £3.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £5.72k £5.71k £6.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0